+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 14, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, January 23, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Vote
February 2, 2012: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor