+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Ruled dead, Joint Rule 4(f) May 19, 2012
On May 19, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 96 Nay: 18
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Brookens was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Brookens
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Suellentrop was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Suellentrop
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, January 23, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
FA_2012_SB291_H_5723
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Brookens was adopted
CR_2012_SB291_S_3567
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2012_SB291_H_5709
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Suellentrop was adopted
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2012: Final Action - Substitute passed as amended
February 2, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor