+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 25 May 2012
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 22, 2012
On May 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 15, 2012 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 83 Nay: 29
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kinzer, Representative Patton and Representative Pauls appointed as conferees
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Owens , Senator King and Senator Haley as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Colloton
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Colloton was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 93 Nay: 29
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 07, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 30 Nay: 10
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (4)
CCR_2012_SB283_S_5334
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CR_2012_SB283_H_4943
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2012_SB283_H_5151
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Colloton was rejected
CR_2012_SB283_S_4073
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
+ − Votes (4)
May 17, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 15, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 21, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor