+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 30 March 2012
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, March 26, 2012
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 125 Nay: 0
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 07, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, January 19, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
FA_2012_SB282_S_4365
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected
FA_2012_SB282_S_4361
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected
CR_2012_SB282_S_4119
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2012: Final Action - Substitute passed
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor