+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 25 Nay: 15
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, January 30, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_SB281_S_4066
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
February 16, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor