+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 30 March 2012
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, March 26, 2012
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 125 Nay: 0
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On January 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 17, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_SB280_S_3564
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2012: Final Action - Passed
February 2, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor