+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On January 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 17, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_SB279_S_3559
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
February 2, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor