+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Died on House Calendar
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 12, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
- Received and Introduced
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 30 Nay: 10
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Powell was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Powell
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, January 23, 2014, 8:00 AM Room 159-S
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CR_2014_SB276_H_4388
Died on House Calendar
FA_2014_SB276_S_3343
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected
FA_2014_SB276_S_3337
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Powell was adopted
+ − Vote
February 12, 2014: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor