+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 25 May 2012
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 22, 2012
On May 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 37 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Shultz, Representative Hermanson and Representative Grant appointed as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Teichman , Senator Masterson and Senator A. Schmidt as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 98 Nay: 26
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Denning
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Denning was rejected Yea: 45 Nay: 76
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 07, 2012, 3:30 PM Room Room 152-S
- Referred to Committee on Insurance
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 152-S
On January 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On January 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CR_2012_SB273_H_4794
Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
FA_2012_SB273_H_4944
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Denning was rejected Yea: 45 Nay: 76
CR_2012_SB273_S_4320
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
May 17, 2012: Concurred with amendments in conference
March 21, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Type:
Primary Sponsor