+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, 05 March 2012
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 02, 2012
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 08, 2012, 9:00 AM Room Docking Room 783
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
On January 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 18, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture
On January 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2012_SB272_H_4046
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2012_SB272_S_3738
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
February 23, 2012: Concurred with amendments
February 16, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 2, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Agriculture
Type:
Primary Sponsor