+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 12, 2015, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2015_SB271_S_1707
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Type:
Primary Sponsor