+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Taxation
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Taddiken
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Taddiken was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Kelly
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kelly was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2012, 10:30 AM Room 152-S
On January 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On January 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
FA_2012_SB267_S_5024
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kelly was adopted
CR_2012_SB267_S_4202
Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
FA_2012_SB267_S_5033
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Taddiken was adopted
+ − Vote
March 21, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Legislative Educational Planning Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor