+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 14 May 2014
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 12, 2014
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 1
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 1
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Carlson, Representative Edmonds and Representative Sawyer appointed as conferees
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Donovan , Senator Tyson and Senator Holland as conferees
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 05, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Taxation
- Received and Introduced
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 28, 2014, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CCR_2014_HB2447_S_4340
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CCR_2014_SB266_H_4576
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CR_2014_SB266_H_3836
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
May 2, 2014: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 2, 2014: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 13, 2014: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 12, 2014: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Type:
Primary Sponsor