+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- Died on House Calendar
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 11, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 112-N
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Taxation
- Received and Introduced
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 18, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, January 23, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Type:
Primary Sponsor