+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died on General Orders
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 29, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2014_SB259_S_3975
Died on General Orders
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor