+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, April 06 , 2015
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 31, 2015
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider adoption of amendment offered by Rep. Sloan adopted.
- Representative Finch raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Sloan was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Sloan
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Sloan was rejected. Yea: 61 Nay: 62
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carlin
- Representative Gonzalez raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 18, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 152S
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
- Received and Introduced
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, February 23, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
FA_2015_SB252_H_1958
Representative Gonzalez raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
FA_2015_SB252_H_1890
Representative Finch raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor