+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to override line item vetoes prevailed. Yea: 86 Nay: 30
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor except line item veto of Section 27(a) and (b), Section 56(e), Section 84(a), and Section 90(a) on Monday, May 20, 2019
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 10, 2019
- Motion to override line item vetoes prevailed. Yea: 27 Nay: 11
On May 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 26 Nay: 14
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 4, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 79 Nay: 45
- Conference committee report now available
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Waymaster, Representative Hoffman and Representative Wolfe Moore appointed as third conferees
- Conference committee report now available
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator McGinn, Senator Billinger and Senator Hawk appointed as second conferees
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Conference committee report now available
- Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Waymaster, Representative Hoffman and Representative Wolfe Moore appointed as second conferees Yea: 63 Nay: 61
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator McGinn, Senator Billinger and Senator Hawk appointed as third conferees
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Conference committee report now available
- Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 42 Nay: 81
- Motion to Reconsider Adopted
- Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Waymaster, Representative Hoffman and Representative Wolfe Moore appointed as fourth conferees
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Billinger, Senator Denning and Senator Hawk appointed as fourth conferees
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator McGinn , Senator Billinger and Senator Hawk as conferees
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Waymaster, Representative Hoffman and Representative Wolfe Moore appointed as conferees
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 99 Nay: 25
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 112-N
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Received and Introduced
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 30, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor