+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 20 March 2012
On March 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 16, 2012
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 115 Nay: 3
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 05, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On January 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 17, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced
- Prefiled for Introduction on Wednesday, November 16, 2011
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_SB249_S_3554
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2012: Final Action - Passed
February 2, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Legislative Post Audit Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor