+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, March 23 , 2016
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Wednesday, March 23, 2016
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Proehl, Representative Ryckman Sr. and Representative Lusker appointed as conferees
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Petersen , Senator Wolf and Senator Pettey as conferees
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 12, 2015, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2016_SB245_H_4083
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor