+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Died on House Calendar
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 09, 2016, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
- Received and Introduced
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 02, 2016, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2016_SB243_H_3999
Died on House Calendar
CR_2016_SB243_S_3124
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor