+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 07 April 2011
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 01, 2011
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 08, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, January 24, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed
February 22, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor