+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action - Not passed; Yea: 55 Nay: 69
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on K-12 Education Budget
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 10, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 546-S
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
- Received and Introduced
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 26 Nay: 12
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected Yea: 11 Nay: 25
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Sykes
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Education
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 25, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor