+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 13 April 2011
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 08, 2011
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 37 Nay: 1
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Energy and Utilities
- Referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 23, 2011, 12:00 PM Room 785 DSOB
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Utilities
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 15, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 548-S
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Utilities
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2011_SB227_H_2459
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2011_SB227_S_2024
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2011: Concurred with amendments
March 31, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
March 21, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor