+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 546-S
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Received and Introduced
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 5
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pilcher-Cook
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 16, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 118-N
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
FA_2018_SB221_S_3423
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was rejected
CR_2018_SB221_S_3188
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor