+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 18, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
- Received and Introduced
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Type:
Primary Sponsor