+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 8, 2018
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 04, 2018
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 118 Nay: 1
- Conference committee report now available
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Hawkins, Representative Concannon and Representative Murnan appointed as conferees
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator V. Schmidt , Senator Bollier and Senator Kelly as conferees
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 0
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, January 22, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 546-S
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Received and Introduced
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 22, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 118-N
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CCR_2018_SB217_H_4138
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 118 Nay: 1
CR_2018_SB217_H_3187
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2017_SB217_S_1621
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor