+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Committee
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 25, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor