+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 May 2012
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 14, 2012
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Landwehr, Representative Donohoe and Representative Flaharty appointed as conferees
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator V. Schmidt , Senator Brungardt and Senator Kelly as conferees
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2012, 1:30 PM Room Docking Room 784
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 15, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_SB211_H_3826
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
May 10, 2012: Concurred with amendments in conference
February 14, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
March 23, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor