+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 29 February 2012
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, February 24, 2012
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Schwartz, Representative Schroeder and Representative Carlin appointed as conferees
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Ostmeyer , Senator McGinn and Senator Francisco as conferees
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 107 Nay: 18
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Schroeder was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Schroeder
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Budget
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, May 04, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 142-S
- Withdrawn from Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources; Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Budget
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Natural Resources
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, March 11, 2011, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 10, 2011, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Natural Resources
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Natural Resources; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
FA_2012_SB191_H_3545
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Schroeder was adopted
CR_2011_SB191_H_2871
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CR_2011_SB191_S_1879
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 2012: Concurred with amendments in conference
February 1, 2012: Final Action - Substitute passed as amended
March 17, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Natural Resources
Type:
Primary Sponsor