+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died on General Orders
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 18, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced