+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Failed
- Motion to concur with amendments failed; Yea: 14 Nay: 24
- Senator Bruce - Motion to postpone action to a day certain - Rejected
- Senator Vratil - Substitute Motion to Concur
- Senator Owens - Motion to Nonconcur
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 81 Nay: 43
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Davis was rejected Yea: 34 Nay: 81
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Davis
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kuether was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Kuether
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Patton was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Patton
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Redistricting
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Redistricting
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 10, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, February 21, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (6)
FA_2012_SB176_H_5267
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Davis was rejected Yea: 34 Nay: 81
FA_2012_SB176_H_5271
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kuether was rejected
CR_2012_SB176_H_5236
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
FA_2012_SB176_H_5269
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Patton was rejected
CR_2011_SB176_H_1959
Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
CR_2011_SB176_S_1524
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2012: Motion to concur with amendments failed
March 29, 2012: Final Action - Substitute passed
February 24, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor