+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 20 Nay: 20
- Motion to Reconsider Adopted
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 19 Nay: 19
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 64 Nay: 59
- Conference committee report now available
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes appointed as second conferees
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Williams, Representative Hoffman and Representative Winn appointed as second conferees
- Conference committee report now available
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Representative Williams, Representative Hoffman, and Representative Winn are appointed to replace Representative Landwehr, Representative Eplee, and Representative Parker on the Conference Committee
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson, and Senator Sykes are appointed to replace Senator Hilderbrand, Senator Gossage, and Senator Pettey on the Conference Committee
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Landwehr, Representative Eplee and Representative Parker appointed as conferees
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Hilderbrand , Senator Gossage and Senator Pettey as conferees
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 3
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 16, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 112-N - CANCELED
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Received and Introduced
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, February 19, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 142-S
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Public Health and Welfare
Type:
Primary Sponsor