+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, May 17, 2021
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 11, 2021
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 4
- Conference committee report now available
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Landwehr, Representative Eplee and Representative Parker appointed as conferees
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Hilderbrand , Senator Gossage and Senator Pettey as conferees
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 98 Nay: 23
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 16, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 112-N - CANCELED
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 15, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Received and Introduced
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 23, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 142-S
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor