+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Committee
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 17, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor