+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 16 April 2013
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2013
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 111 Nay: 9
- Conference committee report now available
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Proehl, Representative Ryckman Sr. and Representative Perry appointed as conferees
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Petersen , Senator Wolf and Senator Pettey as conferees
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 5
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Menghini was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Menghini
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Received and Introduced
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Petersen was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Petersen
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (5)
CCR_2013_SB164_H_2234
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 111 Nay: 9
CR_2013_SB164_H_1934
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2013_SB164_H_2046
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Menghini was rejected
FA_2013_SB164_S_1342
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Petersen was adopted
CR_2013_SB164_S_1305
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2013: Conference Committee Report was adopted
April 4, 2013: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 26, 2013: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 28, 2013: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor