+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, 21 May 2012
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 15, 2012
On May 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 10, 2012 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 123 Nay: 1
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kinzer, Representative Patton and Representative Pauls appointed as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Owens , Senator King and Senator Haley as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 4
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 17, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 16, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CCR_2012_SB160_H_5450
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CR_2011_SB160_S_1580
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2012_SB160_H_4851
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
+ − Votes (4)
May 11, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 10, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 21, 2012: Final Action - Substitute passed
February 24, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor