+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 03 April 2012
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 38 Nay: 2
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 6
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, January 30, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Bruce was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Bruce
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 24 Nay: 12
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 16, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CR_2012_SB159_H_3910
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
FA_2011_SB159_S_2448
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected
FA_2011_SB159_S_2429
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Bruce was adopted
+ − Votes (3)
March 27, 2012: Concurred with amendments
March 21, 2012: Final Action - Substitute passed
March 23, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor