+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Insurance; Referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Financial Institutions; Referred to Committee on Insurance
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
- Received and Introduced
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and referred to Committee of the Whole
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 10, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2015_SB155_S_1045
Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Type:
Primary Sponsor