+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Committee
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 22, 2011, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 16, 2011, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Referred to Committee on Agriculture
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2011_SB147_S_1490
Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Agriculture
Type:
Primary Sponsor