+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Died on House Calendar
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 18, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Taxation
- Received and Introduced
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
- Hearing: Thursday, February 25, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Type:
Primary Sponsor