+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Conference
On April 25, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kinzer, Representative Patton and Representative Pauls appointed as conferees
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Brungardt , Senator Reitz and Senator Faust-Goudeau as conferees
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 91 Nay: 33
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended Yea: 89 Nay: 27
- Committee of the Whole - Handwritten Amendment by Representative Carlin was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Handwritten Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carlin
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ballard was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ballard
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kinzer was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Kinzer
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, March 07, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (4)
FA_2012_SB142_H_5279
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kinzer was adopted
FA_2012_SB142_H_5281
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ballard was rejected
CR_2011_SB142_S_2239
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2012_SB142_H_4867
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
+ − Votes (3)
March 29, 2012: Final Action - Substitute passed as amended
March 28, 2012: Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
March 23, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor