+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 11 April 2013
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 08, 2013
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Goico, Representative Seiwert and Representative Meier appointed as conferees
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Petersen , Senator Wolf and Senator Pettey as conferees
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 3
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Jones was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Jones
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 152-S
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 152-S-CANCELLED
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Veterans, Military and Homeland Security
- Received and Introduced
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Petersen was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Petersen
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (4)
CR_2013_SB136_H_1733
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2013_SB136_H_1887
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Jones was adopted
CR_2013_SB136_S_1196
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2013_SB136_S_1341
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Petersen was adopted
+ − Votes (3)
April 2, 2013: Concurred with amendments in conference
March 26, 2013: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 28, 2013: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor