+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 17, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 15, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2011_SB135_S_1581
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
February 24, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor