+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, April 3, 2019, 3:00 PM Room 582-N
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Taxation
- Received and Introduced
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 30 Nay: 8
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Senator Hilderbrand
Type:
Primary Sponsor