+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 16 , 2015
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 10, 2015
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Schwartz, Representative Boldra and Representative Victors appointed as conferees
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Powell , Senator Kerschen and Senator Francisco as conferees
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 100 Nay: 25
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kuether was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Kuether
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 11, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 346S
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
- Received and Introduced
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator McGinn was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator McGinn
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Natural Resources
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 11, 2015, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (4)
FA_2015_SB124_H_1804
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kuether was adopted
CR_2015_SB124_H_1668
Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
FA_2015_SB124_S_1392
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator McGinn was adopted
CR_2015_SB124_S_1209
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Natural Resources
Type:
Primary Sponsor