+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 07 April 2011
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 01, 2011
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 5
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 03, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Vratil was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Vratil
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, January 31, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2011_SB12_S_0896
Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Vratil
FA_2011_SB12_S_1272
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Vratil was adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed
February 15, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor