+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 22, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 582-N - CANCELED
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Received and Introduced
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 16, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor