+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Saturday, June 06 , 2015
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Saturday, June 06, 2015
- Approved by Governor on Saturday, June 06 , 2015
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Saturday, June 06, 2015
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On June 6, 2015 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 106 Nay: 0
- Emergency final action subject to amendment and debate - Committee report adopted.
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations.
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Taxation
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 09, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 112-N
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Received and Introduced
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 20, 2015, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (4)
CR_2015_SB11_H_2438
Emergency final action subject to amendment and debate - Committee report adopted.
CR_2015_SB11_H_2125
Approved by Governor on Saturday, June 06 , 2015
CR_2015_SB11_H_1765
Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Taxation
CR_2015_SB11_S_0831
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted