+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Died on House Calendar
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 17, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 17, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2011_SB104_S_1522
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
CR_2012_SB104_H_5248
Died on House Calendar
+ − Vote
February 24, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor