+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled on Friday, January 27, 2017
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed on Wednesday, January 25, 2017
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted without roll call
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (72)
Type:
Primary Sponsor